TX HB2573 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Postponed
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Postponed
Summary
Relating to the amount of a county expenditure for which competitive bidding is required.
Title
Relating to the amount of a county expenditure for which competitive bidding is required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Postponed | |
2009-05-14 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-05-11 | Postponed | |
2009-05-11 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-05-05 | Postponed | |
2009-05-05 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-05-01 | Postponed | |
2009-05-01 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-04-23 | Postponed | |
2009-04-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-06 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-03 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-03 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-30 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB253 (Same As) 2009-02-11 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
HB78 (Same As) 2009-05-05 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
HB117 (Same As) 2009-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB78 (Same As) 2009-05-05 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
HB117 (Same As) 2009-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars