TX HB117 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on November 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to the amount of a county expenditure for which competitive bidding is required.
Title
Relating to the amount of a county expenditure for which competitive bidding is required.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Heflin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-17 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-06 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-02-12 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB253 (Same As) 2009-02-11 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
HB78 (Same As) 2009-05-05 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
HB2573 (Same As) 2009-05-14 - Postponed
HB78 (Same As) 2009-05-05 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
HB2573 (Same As) 2009-05-14 - Postponed