TX HB2571 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to information on projected changes in weather, water availability, and climate variability in strategic plans of certain state agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to information on projected changes in weather, water availability, and climate variability in strategic plans of certain state agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-15 - House - HB 2571Third Reading House (Y: 47 N: 84 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-15HouseRecord vote
2015-05-15HouseFailed to pass
2015-05-15HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-14HousePassed to engrossment
2015-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-07HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-16HouseReferred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs
2015-03-16HouseRead first time
2015-03-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback