TX HB2552 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the secretary of state posting on the secretary of state's Internet website a database of certain election information collected from authorities responsible for giving notice of an election.
Title
Relating to the secretary of state posting on the secretary of state's Internet website a database of certain election information collected from authorities responsible for giving notice of an election.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bucy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Elections |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2552 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02552I.htm |