TX HB2533 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to civil suits brought by local governments or certain other persons for violations of certain laws under the jurisdiction of, or rules adopted or orders or permits issued by, the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to civil suits brought by local governments or certain other persons for violations of certain laws under the jurisdiction of, or rules adopted or orders or permits issued by, the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1778 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1072 (Y: 127 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1036 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-22HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-22HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-22HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateAmended
2017-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-08HouseRecord vote
2017-05-08HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-05HouseWithdrawn from schedule
2017-04-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2017-03-23HouseRead first time
2017-02-28HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2533
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02533I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02533H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02533E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02533S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02533F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2533&RcdVtNo=1036&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2533&RcdVtNo=1072&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2533&RcdVtNo=1778&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=9

Bill Comments

feedback