TX HB2519 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study on dropout prevention and recovery before the ninth grade.
Title
Relating to a study on dropout prevention and recovery before the ninth grade.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] | Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R] | Rep. Linda Koop [R] |
Rep. Stan Lambert [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DROPOUTS & AT-RISK STUDENTS
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance