TX HB2504 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the award of scholarship money by the Texas State Board of Public Accountancy to certain accounting students.
Title
Relating to the award of scholarship money by the Texas State Board of Public Accountancy to certain accounting students.
Sponsors
Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Dewayne Burns [R] | Rep. John Bucy [D] | Rep. Travis Clardy [R] |
Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Mihaela Plesa [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#455 (Y: 138 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-25 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#455 |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed |
2023-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB951 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB951 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB951 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PUBLIC ACCOUNTANCY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
SCHOLARSHIPS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PUBLIC ACCOUNTANCY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
SCHOLARSHIPS