TX HB25 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to reimbursement rates for Medicaid acute care therapy services; making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to reimbursement rates for Medicaid acute care therapy services; making an appropriation.

Sponsors

Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Drew Darby [R]
Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Roberto Alonzo [D]Rep. Carol Alvarado [D]
Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Diana Arevalo [D]
Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]
Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]Rep. Byron Cook [R]
Rep. Scott Cosper [R]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]Rep. Dawnna Dukes [D]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]
Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Helen Giddings [D]
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Lance Gooden [R]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]
Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]
Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Linda Koop [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]
Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]
Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]
Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. John Raney [R]
Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]
Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]
Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. Tomas Uresti [D]
Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Jason Villalba [R]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. Armando Walle [D]
Rep. James White [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. William Zedler [R]
Rep. John Zerwas [R]

Roll Calls

2017-08-04 - House - Reason for vote recorded in Journal RV#62 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-08-04 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#61 (Y: 67 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2017-08-03 - House - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal RV#54 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-08-03 - House - Motion to table fails RV#53 (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-07SenateReceived from the House
2017-08-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-08-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-04HouseRecord vote
2017-08-04HousePassed
2017-08-04HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-04HouseRecord vote
2017-08-04HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-08-04HousePoint of order overruled (amendment)
2017-08-04HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-08-03HouseRecord vote
2017-08-03HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-08-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-03HouseAmended
2017-08-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-03HouseRecord vote
2017-08-03HouseMotion to table fails
2017-08-03HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment)
2017-08-03HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-03HouseRead 2nd time
2017-08-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-08-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-07-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-07-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-07-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-07-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-07-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-07-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20HouseReferred to Appropriations
2017-07-20HouseRead first time
2017-07-20HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback