TX HB2499 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Department of Information Resources and the transfer of certain department functions to the comptroller of public accounts.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Department of Information Resources and the transfer of certain department functions to the comptroller of public accounts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-28 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-28 | Record vote | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2011-05-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-28 | Record vote | |
2011-05-28 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2011-05-27 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-26 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-24 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-24 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-24 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2011-05-24 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-24 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-24 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-23 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-23 | House requests conference committee | |
2011-05-23 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2011-05-21 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Amended | |
2011-05-19 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Amended | |
2011-05-19 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-19 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-19 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-19 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Amended | |
2011-05-19 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-19 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-12 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-02 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-02 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Government Organization | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-19 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-18 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-18 | Record vote | |
2011-04-18 | Passed | |
2011-04-18 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-15 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-15 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2011-04-15 | Amendment amended | |
2011-04-15 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-04-15 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2011-04-15 | Amendment amended | |
2011-04-15 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-04-15 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-15 | Record vote | |
2011-04-15 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-04-15 | Record vote | |
2011-04-15 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-04-15 | Amendment to amendment withdrawn | |
2011-04-15 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-04-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-15 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-12 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-11 | Corrected comm. report distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-08 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-07 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-29 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-23 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-03-14 | Read first time | |
2011-03-08 | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
Science & Technology
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
Science & Technology
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills