TX HB2468 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the entitlement of an injured employee to lifetime income benefits under the workers' compensation system.
Title
Relating to the entitlement of an injured employee to lifetime income benefits under the workers' compensation system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#90 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#90 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-05 | House | Record vote RV#90 |
2023-04-05 | House | Passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-04 | House | Amended 1-Burrows |
2023-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-03-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-03-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-03-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-03-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2023-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1033 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB1033 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB1033 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
DIVISION OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION, TEXAS DEPT. OF INSURANCE
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Labor
Labor--Workers' Compensation
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Labor
Labor--Workers' Compensation