TX HB2423 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the periodic emissions and safety inspections of certain motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the periodic emissions and safety inspections of certain motor vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-19HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-19HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-19HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2021-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-16HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2021-03-16HouseRead first time
2021-02-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback