TX HB2414 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation of the Healthy Food Advisory Committee.
Title
Relating to the continuation of the Healthy Food Advisory Committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-07 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-06 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-03 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
AGRICULTURE, COMMISSIONER OF
Financial
Financial--General
FOOD
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
AGRICULTURE, COMMISSIONER OF
Financial
Financial--General
FOOD
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB2414 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB02414I.htm |