TX HB2330 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the criminal penalties for certain controlled substance offenses; increasing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to the criminal penalties for certain controlled substance offenses; increasing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB645 (Same As) 2023-04-10 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
SB645 (Same As) 2023-04-10 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB6 (Same As) 2023-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/23
SB645 (Same As) 2023-04-10 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB6 (Same As) 2023-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/23
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB2330 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02330I.htm |