TX HB6 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of fentanyl poisoning or fentanyl toxicity for purposes of the death certificate and to the criminal penalties for certain controlled substance offenses; increasing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to the designation of fentanyl poisoning or fentanyl toxicity for purposes of the death certificate and to the criminal penalties for certain controlled substance offenses; increasing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1895 (Y: 125 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#683 (Y: 124 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Amended RV#643 (Y: 121 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#683 (Y: 124 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Amended RV#643 (Y: 121 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-19 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-19 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2023-05-19 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-19 | House | Record vote RV#1895 |
2023-05-19 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#683 |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#643 |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-27 | House | Amended 1-Moody |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB645 (Same As) 2023-04-10 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB2330 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
SB645 (Same As) 2023-04-10 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB2330 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
SB645 (Same As) 2023-04-10 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Subjects
BIRTH & DEATH CERTIFICATES
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment