TX HB2299 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to verification of alcohol content for prior approval of malt beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to verification of alcohol content for prior approval of malt beverages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#243 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-18SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-18HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-17HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-15HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-12SenateRecord vote
2017-05-12SenatePassed
2017-05-12SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-12SenateRecord vote
2017-05-12SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-12SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-12SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-09SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-19SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-04-19SenateRead first time
2017-04-18SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-13HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-13HouseRecord vote
2017-04-13HousePassed
2017-04-13HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-13HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-13HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-13HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-06HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-03HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-15HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2017-03-15HouseRead first time
2017-02-22HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback