TX HB2289 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of amusement rides by the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation, including the creation of the amusement ride regulation advisory board; providing authority to increase a fee.
Title
Relating to the regulation of amusement rides by the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation, including the creation of the amusement ride regulation advisory board; providing authority to increase a fee.
Sponsors
Rep. Lina Ortega [D] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1495 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions