TX HB2275 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to creating a task force to develop uniform standards for subdivisions in the unincorporated areas of counties near the international border and in economically distressed counties.
Title
Relating to creating a task force to develop uniform standards for subdivisions in the unincorporated areas of counties near the international border and in economically distressed counties.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Armando Martinez [D] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] |
Rep. Mark Shelton [R] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2009-05-30 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-29 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-29 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-28 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-28 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2009-05-23 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-23 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-23 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-23 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-23 | House requests conference committee | |
2009-05-23 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-20 | Record vote | |
2009-05-20 | Passed | |
2009-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-20 | Record vote | |
2009-05-20 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-20 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-20 | Amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-20 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-08 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-27 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | |
2009-04-27 | Read first time | |
2009-04-01 | Received from the House | |
2009-03-31 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-03-31 | Record vote | |
2009-03-31 | Passed | |
2009-03-31 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-03-31 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-03-31 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-03-27 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-03-26 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-23 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-03-23 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-03 | Filed |