TX HB2228 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of the portion of Business Interstate Highway 20-J in Colorado City as the James G. "Jim" Baum Memorial Highway.
Title
Relating to the designation of the portion of Business Interstate Highway 20-J in Colorado City as the James G. "Jim" Baum Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-08 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-08 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1124 |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1124 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21