TX SB1124 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of the portion of Business Interstate Highway 20-J in Colorado City as the James "Jim" Baum Memorial Highway.
Title
Relating to the designation of the portion of Business Interstate Highway 20-J in Colorado City as the James "Jim" Baum Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-10 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-10 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#898 |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 2228 |
2021-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2021-04-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2228 (Same As) 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call