TX HB2181 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to designating the Interstate Highway 45 causeway to Galveston the George and Cynthia Mitchell Memorial Causeway.
Title
Relating to designating the Interstate Highway 45 causeway to Galveston the George and Cynthia Mitchell Memorial Causeway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - HB 2181Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2015-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-07 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2015-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2015-04-07 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-03-31 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2015-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed |