TX HB217 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to postconviction forensic DNA testing.
Title
Relating to postconviction forensic DNA testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#429 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#429 |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1884 (Same As) 2021-03-26 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Posttrial Procedure
DNA
FORENSIC TESTING
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Posttrial Procedure
DNA
FORENSIC TESTING
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF