TX HB2154 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Point of order sustained Article III, Section 30, and Article III, Section 35
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a commission to study the needs of areas of the state significantly affected by oil and gas production.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a commission to study the needs of areas of the state significantly affected by oil and gas production.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HousePoint of order sustained Article III, Section 30, and Article III, Section 35
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-09HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-09HouseAmended 1-Landgraf
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-24HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-24HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-24HouseRecalled from subcommittee
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in subcommittee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2019-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in s/c
2019-04-03HouseConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-02HousePosting rule suspended
2019-04-01HouseReferred directly to subcommittee by chair
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Appropriations
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HJR82 (Enabling for) 2019-05-17 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback