TX HJR82 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the creation of and use of money in the generate recurring oil wealth for Texas (GROW Texas) fund and allocating certain general revenues to that fund, the economic stabilization fund, and the state highway fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the creation of and use of money in the generate recurring oil wealth for Texas (GROW Texas) fund and allocating certain general revenues to that fund, the economic stabilization fund, and the state highway fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - Adopted RV#943 (Y: 121 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-16SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Finance
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-02SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#943
2019-05-02HouseAdopted
2019-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-24HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-24HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-24HouseRecalled from subcommittee
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in subcommittee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred directly to subcommittee by chair
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HB2154 (Enabled by) 2019-05-10 - Point of order sustained Article III, Section 30, and Article III, Section 35

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback