TX HB214 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House International Relations & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House International Relations & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the dissemination of information about historically underutilized businesses and the expansion of the small business development center network.
Title
Relating to the dissemination of information about historically underutilized businesses and the expansion of the small business development center network.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB298 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Education
Education--Higher
EDUCATION--HIGHER--CURRICULUM
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
HISTORICALLY UNDERUTILIZED BUSINESSES
SMALL BUSINESS ASSISTANCE, OFFICE OF
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Education
Education--Higher
EDUCATION--HIGHER--CURRICULUM
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
HISTORICALLY UNDERUTILIZED BUSINESSES
SMALL BUSINESS ASSISTANCE, OFFICE OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB214 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00214I.htm |