TX HB2101 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of reroofing contractors; providing administrative and civil penalties; authorizing fees; requiring an occupational registration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of reroofing contractors; providing administrative and civil penalties; authorizing fees; requiring an occupational registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - Failed to pass to engrossment RV#1245 (Y: 33 N: 99 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1245
2019-05-09HouseFailed to pass to engrossment
2019-05-09HouseAmended 1-Anderson
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1168 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback