TX HB2100 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 63-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the protection of expressive activities at public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the protection of expressive activities at public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#800 (Y: 85 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#779 (Y: 82 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#778 (Y: 61 N: 76 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#777 (Y: 59 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#776 (Y: 65 N: 75 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - 3-Leach RV#775 (Y: 82 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#800
2019-04-30HousePassed
2019-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#779
2019-04-29HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-29HouseAmendment withdrawn 10-J. González
2019-04-29HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2019-04-29HouseAmendment(s) offered 10-J. González
2019-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#778
2019-04-29HouseAmendment fails of adoption 9-J. Turner
2019-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#777
2019-04-29HouseAmendment fails of adoption 8-C. Turner
2019-04-29HouseAmended 7-Wu
2019-04-29HouseAmended 6-Wu
2019-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#776
2019-04-29HouseAmendment fails of adoption 5-Wu
2019-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#775
2019-04-29HouseAmended 4-Canales
2019-04-29HouseAmended 3-Leach
2019-04-29HouseAmended 1-Cain
2019-04-29HouseAmendment to amendment fails of adoption 2-Wu
2019-04-29HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2, and Rule 11, Section 6(e)
2019-04-29HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Cain
2019-04-29HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
2019-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2100
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02100I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02100H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02100E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2100&RcdVtNo=775&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2100&RcdVtNo=776&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2100&RcdVtNo=777&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2100&RcdVtNo=778&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2100&RcdVtNo=779&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2100&RcdVtNo=800&Ch=H&Dt=04/30/2019

Bill Comments

feedback