TX HB209 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing the possession, use, cultivation, distribution, transportation, and delivery of medical cannabis for medical use by qualifying patients with certain debilitating medical conditions and the licensing of dispensing organizations and testing facilities; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to authorizing the possession, use, cultivation, distribution, transportation, and delivery of medical cannabis for medical use by qualifying patients with certain debilitating medical conditions and the licensing of dispensing organizations and testing facilities; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2019-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-09 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB90 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MARIHUANA
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Crimes--Drugs
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MARIHUANA
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB209 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00209I.htm |