TX SB90 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorizing the possession, use, cultivation, distribution, transportation, and delivery of medical cannabis for medical use by qualifying patients with certain debilitating medical conditions and the licensing of dispensing organizations and testing facilities; authorizing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorizing the possession, use, cultivation, distribution, transportation, and delivery of medical cannabis for medical use by qualifying patients with certain debilitating medical conditions and the licensing of dispensing organizations and testing facilities; authorizing fees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2019-01-28SenateCo-author authorized
2019-01-16SenateCo-author authorized
2018-11-12SenateFiled
2018-11-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB209 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Left pending in subcommittee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback