TX HB2089 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the detection and mitigation of plant pests and diseases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the detection and mitigation of plant pests and diseases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Agriculture & Livestock
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB731 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback