TX HB2082 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the designation of a liaison to assist first responders with workers' compensation claims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the designation of a liaison to assist first responders with workers' compensation claims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1071 (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1035 (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-08HouseRecord vote
2017-05-08HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-19HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-16HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2017-03-16HouseRead first time
2017-02-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback