TX HB2065 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-05 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-05 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to automatic employee participation in and administration of a deferred compensation plan provided by the Harris County Hospital District.
Title
Relating to automatic employee participation in and administration of a deferred compensation plan provided by the Harris County Hospital District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - HB 2065Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-23 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-23 | House | Passed |
2015-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2015-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DEFERRED COMPENSATION
HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Hospitals
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--County & District
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Hospitals
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--County & District
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital