TX HB2063 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the recording and effective date of certain documents relating to nonjudicial foreclosure sales.
Title
Relating to the recording and effective date of certain documents relating to nonjudicial foreclosure sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - House - HB 2063Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-17 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2015-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-05 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-28 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2015-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Financial
Financial--General
FORECLOSURES
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property
Business & Commerce--General
Financial
Financial--General
FORECLOSURES
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property