TX HB2058 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to preauthorization and concurrent review of certain health care services under the workers' compensation system.
Title
Relating to preauthorization and concurrent review of certain health care services under the workers' compensation system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-09 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-17 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2017-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2058 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02058I.htm |