TX HB2001 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to procedures and practices governing the appeal of a disciplinary action within the Department of Public Safety.
Title
Relating to procedures and practices governing the appeal of a disciplinary action within the Department of Public Safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1130 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1130 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
EVIDENCE
Law Enforcement
PUBLIC SAFETY COMMISSION
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Law Enforcement
PUBLIC SAFETY COMMISSION
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions