TX HB2 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 66-6)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Reported favorably as substituted
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to providing property tax relief through the public school finance system and property tax appraisal and administration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to providing property tax relief through the public school finance system and property tax appraisal and administration.

Sponsors

Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]
Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. Ben Bumgarner [R]
Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Terry Canales [D]
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. David Cook [R]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. Charles Cunningham [R]
Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Mano DeAyala [R]Rep. James Frank [R]
Rep. Frederick Frazier [R]Rep. Stan Gerdes [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]
Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Caroline Harris [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Richard Hayes [R]
Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Lacey Hull [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]
Rep. Carrie Isaac [R]Rep. Jacey Jetton [R]Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]
Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]
Rep. Terri Leo-Wilson [R]Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Janie Lopez [R]Rep. John Lujan [R]
Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]
Rep. Angelia Orr [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]
Rep. Glenn Rogers [R]Rep. Nate Schatzline [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]
Rep. Shelby Slawson [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. David Spiller [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]
Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Carl Tepper [R]Rep. Kronda Thimesch [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]
Rep. Ellen Troxclair [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Cody Vasut [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-20HouseReported favorably as substituted
2023-03-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2023-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-03HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2023-03-03HouseRead first time
2023-03-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HJR1 (Enabling for) 2023-03-20 - Reported favorably as substituted

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback