TX HB1971 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to imposing an additional fee for the registration of electric and hybrid vehicles.
Title
Relating to imposing an additional fee for the registration of electric and hybrid vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken King [R] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2019-05-01 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
HYBRID VEHICLES
STATE HIGHWAY FUND
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
HYBRID VEHICLES
STATE HIGHWAY FUND
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1971 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01971I.htm |