TX HB1966 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notice of the health of children attending a child-care facility.
Title
Relating to notice of the health of children attending a child-care facility.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Joe Deshotel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB873 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1966 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01966I.htm |