TX HB1915 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the adoption of an ethics policy by the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas.
Title
Relating to the adoption of an ethics policy by the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-25 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CANCER
CANCER PREVENTION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF TEXAS
Ethics
Health
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
CANCER PREVENTION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF TEXAS
Ethics
Health
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB1915 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB01915I.htm |