TX HB1884 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to contributions to, benefits from, and the administration of systems and programs administered by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.
Title
Relating to contributions to, benefits from, and the administration of systems and programs administered by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.
Sponsors
Rep. William Callegari [R] | Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] | Rep. Debbie Riddle [R] |
Rep. Matt Schaefer [R] | Rep. Ralph Sheffield [R] | Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-22 | House | Amendment(s) considered in committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Pensions |
2013-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed |