TX HB1869 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the definition of debt for the purposes of calculating certain ad valorem tax rates of a taxing unit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the definition of debt for the purposes of calculating certain ad valorem tax rates of a taxing unit.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-12HouseAmendment(s) considered in committee
2021-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-03-11HouseRead first time
2021-02-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback