TX HB1869 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to local governments that may consider a bidder's principal place of business when awarding a contract.
Title
Relating to local governments that may consider a bidder's principal place of business when awarding a contract.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-19 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-18 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-17 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Passed | |
2011-05-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-17 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-17 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-17 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-06 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-06 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-04 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-04-20 | Read first time | |
2011-04-11 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-08 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-07 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-03-31 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-03-30 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-29 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-29 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-24 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2011-03-07 | Read first time | |
2011-02-25 | Filed |