TX HB1862 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a county to restrict sex offenders from child safety zones in the unincorporated area of the county.
Title
Relating to the authority of a county to restrict sex offenders from child safety zones in the unincorporated area of the county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2021-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB441 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
CHILD SAFETY ZONES
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Day Care
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Day Care
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety
SEXUAL OFFENDERS