TX HB1862 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of certain river or stream segments as being of unique ecological value.
Title
Relating to the designation of certain river or stream segments as being of unique ecological value.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#226 (Y: 91 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Read 2nd time RV#218 (Y: 97 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Read 2nd time RV#218 (Y: 97 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-12 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-12 | House | Passed |
2017-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-11 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-14 | House | Filed |