TX HB1849 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the modification of an order establishing the conservatorship or possession of or access to a child after a conservator's death.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the modification of an order establishing the conservatorship or possession of or access to a child after a conservator's death.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1597 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Amended RV#372 (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1597
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-26HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-26HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-26HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-04SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-04SenateRead first time
2021-04-22SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-21HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-21HouseRecord vote RV#372
2021-04-21HousePassed as amended
2021-04-21HouseAmended 1-Cook and Sanford
2021-04-21HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-20HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-20HouseAmended 1-Sanford
2021-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2021-03-11HouseRead first time
2021-02-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB733 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1849
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01849I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01849H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01849E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01849S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01849F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01849H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01849H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01849I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01849H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01849E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01849E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01849S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01849S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01849F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1849&RcdVtNo=372&Ch=H&Dt=04/21/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=64
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1849&RcdVtNo=1597&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback