TX HB184 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the penalties for possession of one ounce or less of marihuana or a synthetic cannabinoid by certain defendants.
Title
Relating to the penalties for possession of one ounce or less of marihuana or a synthetic cannabinoid by certain defendants.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Dutton [D] | Rep. Lon Burnam [D] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2013-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2012-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
MARIHUANA
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
SYNTHETIC CANNABINOIDS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Crimes--Drugs
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
MARIHUANA
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
SYNTHETIC CANNABINOIDS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses