TX HB1818 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Railroad Commission of Texas; providing for the imposition of fees.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Railroad Commission of Texas; providing for the imposition of fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Gonzales [R] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] |
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R] | Sen. Craig Estes [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#116 (Y: 123 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Amendment tabled RV#113 (Y: 94 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Amendment tabled RV#112 (Y: 102 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Amendment adopted as amended RV#111 (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Amendment to amendment fails of adoption RV#110 (Y: 0 N: 140 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - Amendment tabled RV#109 (Y: 130 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Amendment tabled RV#108 (Y: 110 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Amendment tabled RV#107 (Y: 105 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#116 (Y: 123 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Amendment tabled RV#113 (Y: 94 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Amendment tabled RV#112 (Y: 102 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Amendment adopted as amended RV#111 (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Amendment to amendment fails of adoption RV#110 (Y: 0 N: 140 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - Amendment tabled RV#109 (Y: 130 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Amendment tabled RV#108 (Y: 110 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Amendment tabled RV#107 (Y: 105 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-22 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-10 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-09 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-29 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed |
2017-03-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-03-28 | House | Amended |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-03-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-03-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-03-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2017-03-28 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment amended |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment amended |
2017-03-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment to amendment fails of adoption |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-03-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-03-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-03-28 | House | Amended |
2017-03-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-03-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-28 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2017-03-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-03-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-03-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-13 | House | Amendment(s) considered in committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-13 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2017-02-28 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
Mines & Mineral Resources
Oil & Gas
PIPELINE SAFETY
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Safety
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas
Mines & Mineral Resources
Oil & Gas
PIPELINE SAFETY
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Safety
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas