TX HB1791 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the facilitation and operation of space flight activities in this state.
Title
Relating to the facilitation and operation of space flight activities in this state.
Sponsors
Rep. John Davis [R] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Rene Oliveira [D] | Rep. Charles Anderson [R] |
Rep. Philip Cortez [D] | Rep. Hubert Vo [D] | Sen. Robert Deuell [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - House - HB 1791Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Economic Development |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed |
2013-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2013-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aeronautics
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
SPACEPORTS
Transportation
Transportation--Aviation
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
SPACEPORTS
Transportation
Transportation--Aviation