TX HB1775 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the oversight and election of board members for certain emergency services districts.
Title
Relating to the oversight and election of board members for certain emergency services districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1424 (Y: 120 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1424 |
2023-05-10 | House | Passed |
2023-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-09 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 40, and Rule 11, Section 2 |
2023-05-09 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2023-05-06 | House | Postponed 5/9/23 10:00 AM |
2023-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2023-03-07 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB660 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Local Government
SB660 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Local Government
SB660 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Local Government
Subjects
BRAZORIA COUNTY
Elections
Elections--General
EMERGENCY SERVICES COMMISSIONERS, BOARD OF
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Elections
Elections--General
EMERGENCY SERVICES COMMISSIONERS, BOARD OF
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous