TX HB1756 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the practice of dentistry and the provision of teledentistry dental services.
Title
Relating to the practice of dentistry and the provision of teledentistry dental services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB792 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
DENTAL EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
DENTAL SERVICES
DENTISTS & DENTISTRY
Health
Health--General
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
DENTAL SERVICES
DENTISTS & DENTISTRY
Health
Health--General
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1756 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01756I.htm |