TX HB1727 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the issuance of certain search warrants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the issuance of certain search warrants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-03SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-05-03SenateRead first time
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-27HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HousePassed
2017-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-03-30HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-03-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-03-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-27HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-03-06HouseRead first time
2017-02-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback